Barnes et al v. Depuy Inc et al
Plaintiff: Richard L Barnes and Adrienne Barnes
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson and Depuy Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv01308
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-03321. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Conditional Transfer Order - 317 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 5/31/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc answer now due 6/21/2019; DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. answer now due 6/21/2019; DePuy, Inc. answer now due 6/21/2019; Johnson & Johnson answer now due 6/21/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc; DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.; DePuy, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson.(Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party DePuy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc(pty:dft))(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for June 20, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03321 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Adrienne Barnes, Richard L Barnes, (Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed under a separate event, not as an attachment to the complaint: Civil Events>Other Filings>Miscellaneous Filings>Civil Cover Sheet CV-71. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23615544 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Richard L Barnes, Adrienne Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Joseph H Saunders added to party Adrienne Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph H Saunders added to party Richard L Barnes(pty:pla))(Saunders, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 5/31/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Depuy Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Barnes
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Barnes
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?