Webb v. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Webb
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01358
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. (zkc)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To the extent that it be deemed necessary and having considered Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Issue Summons, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to issue summons as to Defendant Experian lnformation Solutions, Inc. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/15/2019) (zkc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims asserted against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC in the above-styled and -numbered civil action are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with costs taxed against the party incurring the same. This is a partial dismissal and does not impact Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendant. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/12/2019) (ndt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Issue Summons filed by Jeremy Webb (Klote, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Jeremy Webb (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text) (Klote, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc filed by Jeremy Webb. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Motil, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 6/12/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC ; served on 6/12/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC. (rekc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
June 6, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeremy Webb. (See #1 for image.) (rekc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jeremy Webb. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10033506) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Webb
Represented By: Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Represented By: Gregory Michael Klote
Represented By: Gregory Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?