Drivetrain LLC et al v. Off Duty Services Inc
Plaintiff: Drivetrain LLC
Defendant: Off Duty Services Inc
Debtor: ADPT DFW Holdings LLC
Not Classified By Court: Case Admin Sup and Stacey G Jernigan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01377
Filed: June 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary D. Underdahl. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/15/2019) (chmb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Gary D. Underdahl filed by Drivetrain LLC. (aaa)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary D. Underdahl. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/28/2019) (chmb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10069911) filed by Drivetrain LLC (Attachments: #1 Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Gary D, Underdahl added to party Drivetrain LLC(pty:pla) (Underdahl, Gary)
June 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. New Case Notes Mon Jun 10 11:56:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 10, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (epm)
June 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of transmittal of motion for Withdrawal of Reference in #bankruptcy case number 19-03073 to presiding judge. The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court. A link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided for your review. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Motio to withdraw the reference) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drivetrain LLC et al v. Off Duty Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drivetrain LLC
Represented By: Kara E Casteel
Represented By: Gary D Underdahl
Represented By: David W Elmquist
Represented By: Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: ADPT DFW Holdings LLC
Represented By: Louis Raymond Strubeck, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stacey G Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off Duty Services Inc
Represented By: Sarah Melissa Cox
Represented By: Howard Marc Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?