Turner v. Dallas Veterans Administration HDOM Program et al
Plaintiff: Julian M Turner
Defendant: V Linden, S Woods, FNU Hendricks, Janae Jameson, Dallas Veterans Emergency Room Staff, Dallas Veterans Administration HDOM Program, Chaplin Michael BT LNU, FNU Chance, Keithian LNU, FNU Nunley and Michael BT LNU
Case Number: 3:2019cv01392
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 9. Thu Jul 11 14:22:01 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Accepting #7 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief and Emergency Restraining Order is summarily DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/11/2019) (zkc)
June 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Jun 24 09:40:49 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Julian M Turner must address the following deficiency: The complaint does not meet the basic pleading requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a).. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/15/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2019) (epm)
June 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Jun 13 10:20:47 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: MOTION for Injunctive Relief, and Emergency Restraining Order. Plaintiff's motion should be DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/12/2019) (aaa)
June 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Jun 12 14:50:43 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/12/2019) (chmb)
June 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Tue Jun 11 15:19:15 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julian M Turner. (zkc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Julian M Turner. (zkc)
June 11, 2019 MOTION for Injunctive Relief, and Emergency Restraining Order filed by Julian M Turner (contained in doc. no. #3 ). (zkc) Modified on 6/11/2019 (zkc).
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against FNU Chance, Dallas Veterans Administration HDOM Program, Dallas Veterans Emergency Room Staff, FNU Hendricks, Janae Jameson, Keithian LNU, Michael BT LNU, V Linden, FNU Nunley, S Woods filed by Julian M Turner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Dallas Veterans Administration HDOM Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janae Jameson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Veterans Emergency Room Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Veterans Administration HDOM Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplin Michael BT LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keithian LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael BT LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian M Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?