Bevineau v. Flemings et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bevineau
Defendant: Cory Flemings and KC Towing
Case Number: 3:2019cv01411
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Jun 24 09:48:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Joseph Bevineau must address the following deficiency: The complaint does not meet the basic pleading requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/15/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2019) (epm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Bevineau. (zkc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Bevineau. (zkc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cory Flemings, KC Towing filed by Joseph Bevineau. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (zkc)
June 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Thu Jun 13 15:08:00 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bevineau v. Flemings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Flemings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bevineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?