Alexander v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Temika Alexander
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2019cv01413
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security, served on 7/2/2019; US Attorney, served on 6/26/2019; Attorney General, served on 7/2/2019. (rekc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re: #1 Complaint, #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #9 Summons. Signed on 6/14/2019. (mla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mla)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons and deliver the summons and a copy of the complaint in the case to the U.S. Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/14/2019) (chmb)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/14/2019) (chmb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (svc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Temika Alexander re #4 MOTION Waive Local Counsel (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Waive Local Counsel filed by Temika Alexander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Temika Alexander. (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Temika Alexander (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Temika Alexander. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temika Alexander
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?