Classic Americana LLC v. Adell et al
Plaintiff: Classic Americana LLC
Defendant: Ralph Lameti, Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc and STN.com Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01419
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Classic Americana LLC re #21 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Miller, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Classic Americana LLC re #20 Response/Objection (Miller, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Classic Americana LLC re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2), (3) and (6), #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Miller, David)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER resetting FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference for 9/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2019) (ext)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AGREED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/16/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/15/2019) (aaa) Modified on 7/16/2019 to remove scheduling conference date, as it will be addressed in a forthcoming order (ctf).
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2), (3) and (6), #11 Scheduling Order,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Classic Americana LLC (Miller, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by Ralph Lameti re #15 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Rogers, L)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ralph Lameti re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Rogers, L)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ralph Lameti (Rogers, L)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc re #12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2), (3) and (6) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Ex. 1 -- Adell Affidavit, #2 Exhibit(s) Trust document) (Nolan, Patricia)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2), (3) and (6) filed by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc (Nolan, Patricia)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling conference hearing on 8/2/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/21/2019) (aaa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court documents, #2 Exhibit(s) State court docket sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) Citation -- Adell, #5 Exhibit(s) Citation -- Adell and STN, #6 Exhibit(s) Citation -- STN, #7 Exhibit(s) Citation -- Lameti, #8 Exhibit(s) Mtn. Sub. Service w proposed order, #9 Exhibit(s) Order allowing sub service, #10 Exhibit(s) Return of service -- Adell, #11 Exhibit(s) Return of service -- Adell/STN, #12 Exhibit(s) Return of service -- STN, #13 Exhibit(s) Return of service -- Lameti, #14 Exhibit(s) Notice of 1st dwop hearing, #15 Exhibit(s) Notice of 2nd dwop hearing, #16 Exhibit(s) Co-defendant consent, #17 Exhibit(s) Franchise reports of Plaintiff) (Nolan, Patricia) Modified title on 6/21/2019 (zkc).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin Bagdady. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/19/2019) (ndt)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant's notice of removal, filed June 14, 2019, appears to predicate subject matter jurisdiction upon diversity of citizenship, 28 U.S.C. 1332, but fails to allege properly the citizenship of Defendant Classic Americana LLC for the following reasons: Failure to allege citizenship of all members of limited liability company. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/19/2019) (ndt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Justin Bagdady (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10055942) filed by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc (Nolan, Patricia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc. (Nolan, Patricia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, by Defendants Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc. (Nolan, Patricia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, by Defendants Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc, STN.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Nolan, Patricia) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened document on 6/17/2019) (awc). (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened document on 6/17/2019) (awc). Modified on 6/17/2019 (awc).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc., STN.com Inc. (Nolan, Patricia) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened document on 6/17/2019) (awc). Modified on 6/17/2019 (awc).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 160th Judicial District, Dallas County, case number DC-19-01294 filed by Kevin Adell, Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc., STN.com, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10053148) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of state court filings, #2 Exhibit(s) State court docket sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) Citation for Adell, #5 Exhibit(s) Citation for Adell/STN, #6 Exhibit(s) Citatoin for STN, #7 Exhibit(s) Citation for Lameti, #8 Exhibit(s) Mtn. Sub. Service w prop order, #9 Exhibit(s) Order re sub. service, #10 Exhibit(s) Return of service - Adell, #11 Exhibit(s) Return of servie - Adell/STN, #12 Exhibit(s) Return of service -- STN, #13 Exhibit(s) Return of service - Lameti, #14 Exhibit(s) Notice of dwop hearing, #15 Exhibit(s) 2nd notice of dwop hearing, #16 Exhibit(s) Co-defendant consent to removal) (Nolan, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Classic Americana LLC v. Adell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Lameti
Represented By: L Kirstine Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Adell
Represented By: Patricia A Nolan
Represented By: Justin P Bagdady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Adell/STN.com Inc
Represented By: Patricia A Nolan
Represented By: Justin P Bagdady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STN.com Inc
Represented By: Patricia A Nolan
Represented By: Justin P Bagdady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Classic Americana LLC
Represented By: David B Miller
Represented By: Steven A Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?