Fincher et al v. Exeter Finance LLC et al
Plaintiff: Duane Meyers, Alicia Alford-Meyers and Kenneth Fincher
Defendant: Benny Cherry, Mark Nerios, Exeter Finance LLC, Glenn Castleberry and Mark Mooney
Case Number: 3:2019cv01423
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/15/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/25/2019) (zkc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benny Cherry, Exeter Finance LLC, Mark Mooney, Mark Nerios identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Blackstone Group LP, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Enzo Parent LLC for Exeter Finance LLC. (Bell, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Benny Cherry, Exeter Finance LLC, Mark Mooney, Mark Nerios. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bell, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mark Mooney; served on 7/8/2019. (rekc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' answer due by 7/24/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/10/2019) (rekc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Kneale Brodrick on behalf of Benny Cherry, Exeter Finance LLC, Mark Mooney, Mark Nerios. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Brodrick, Collin) Modified parties on 7/9/2019 (rekc).
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Benny Cherry, Exeter Finance LLC, Mark Mooney, Mark Nerios (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Michael) Modified parties on 7/9/2019 (rekc).
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Exeter Finance LLC; served on 6/21/2019. (ykp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Duane Meyers, Alicia Alford-Meyers, Kenneth Fincher. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Goodman, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Benny Cherry; served on 6/18/2019; Mark Nerios; served on 6/18/2019. (ykp)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glenn Castleberry, Benny Cherry, Exeter Finance LLC, Mark Mooney, Mark Nerios. (mla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Alicia Alford-Meyers, Kenneth Fincher, Duane Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Goodman, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Duane Meyers, Alicia Alford-Meyers, Kenneth Fincher. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10053712) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fincher et al v. Exeter Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Cherry
Represented By: Michael H Bell
Represented By: Collin Kneale Brodrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Nerios
Represented By: Michael H Bell
Represented By: Collin Kneale Brodrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance LLC
Represented By: Michael H Bell
Represented By: Collin Kneale Brodrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mooney
Represented By: Michael H Bell
Represented By: Collin Kneale Brodrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Meyers
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Alford-Meyers
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Fincher
Represented By: Robert E Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?