Brand Law PLLC v. Alexander et al
Plaintiff: Brand Law PLLC
Defendant: United States of America, Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine and Rehabilitation Center, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC and The Pain Medicine and Rehabilitation Center PC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01432
Filed: June 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a response to the pending motion to dismiss by no later than 3:00 p.m. on 8/20/2019. No further extensions will be permitted. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/12/2019) (aaa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC re: #13 First MOTION to Extend Time First (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klatsky, Howard)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Extend Time First filed by Brand Law PLLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Brand, Volney)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Admission filed by Brand Law PLLC (Brand, Volney)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC. (Klatsky, Howard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens (Klatsky, Howard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens (Klatsky, Howard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens filed by Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klatsky, Howard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Howard J Klatsky added to party Anthony Alexander(pty:dft), Attorney Howard J Klatsky added to party Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC(pty:dft) (Klatsky, Howard)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that VOLNEY BRAND shall have 21 days to file an application for admission pro hac vice or, if he applies for full admission, to file a notice advising the Court that the application has been approved and the oath given. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/16/2019) (mla)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brand Law PLLC. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brand, Volney)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Anthony Alexander, Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC, The Pain Medicine and Rehabilitation Center PC, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (rekc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Payment for #1 Complaint filed by Brand Law PLLC. ($400; Receipt number 0539-10060300). (Brand, Volney)
June 16, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
June 16, 2019 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brand Law PLLC (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10060300). Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brand, Volney) Added filing fee info on 6/19/2019 (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand Law PLLC v. Alexander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Alexander
Represented By: Howard J Klatsky
Represented By: Thomas W Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Medicine and Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Medicine Center of SE Indiana LLC
Represented By: Howard J Klatsky
Represented By: Thomas W Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pain Medicine and Rehabilitation Center PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brand Law PLLC
Represented By: Volney Brand
Represented By: Volney LeRon Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?