Feltman v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jackie Feltman
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2019cv01441
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill; served on 7/12/2019; U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Texas, served on 7/11/2019; U.S. Attorney General, served on 7/11/2019. (zkc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Business Reply Card signed by USMS, re: #5 Order, #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #4 Consent Form. Signed on 6/19/2019. (zkc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zkc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a true copy of this order to the plaintiff, issue summons for defendant, and deliver the summons and copies of the complaint and the notice of right to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge to the United States Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/19/2019) (zkc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (zkc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jackie Feltman. (Kelly, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jackie D. Feltman (Kelly, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill filed by Jackie D. Feltman. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feltman v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Feltman
Represented By: Michael T Kelly
Represented By: Maria Laura Sigaud Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?