Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc v. JE Lortie Cie Ltee / Co Ltd
Plaintiff: Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant: JE Lortie Cie Ltee / Co Ltd
Case Number: 3:2019cv01474
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frederick J.M. Price. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/1/2019) (chmb)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David L. Nocilly. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/1/2019) (chmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Frederick J.M. Price (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10108588) filed by Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rubin, Brent)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David L. Nocilly (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10108524) filed by Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rubin, Brent)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (zkc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/21/2019) (zkc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Buckingham Group Inc for Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc. (Howland, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against JE Lortie Cie Ltee / Co Ltd filed by Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10067536) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Howland, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc v. JE Lortie Cie Ltee / Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JE Lortie Cie Ltee / Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buckingham Manufacturing Co Inc
Represented By: Mark C Howland
Represented By: Brent Michael Rubin
Represented By: David L. Nocilly
Represented By: Frederick J M Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?