Garcia v. Marie-Blanche Nana Tchetgen et al
Plaintiff: Senaida Garcia
Defendant: Endo Phamaceuticals, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc, Urology Associates of North Texas PLLC, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc, Ethicon Inc, Marie-Blanche Tchetgen MD PA, Ethicon US LLC, American Medical Systems Holdings Inc and Marie-Blanche Nana Tchetgen
Case Number: 3:2019cv01476
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #20 Motion to Remand and denying as moot #7 , #10 , #12 , #61 remaining motions. The clerk of the court is directed to remand this action to County Court at Law No. 5, Dallas County, Texas, in accordance with the usual procedure. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/22/2019) (chmb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 61 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Senaida Garcia with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Freeman, Max)
June 24, 2019 Filing 60 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1476-L. (axm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 59 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
June 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish (related to case no. 3:13-cv-4775-G). Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to the case. (zkc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 58 Case electronically transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-17975. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #57 Conditional Remand Order. ERROR: Image not certified. CORRECTION: Image certified and replaced. (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 57 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy transferring the action on this conditional remand order for remand to its respective transferor court; the transferee court in this litigation has advised the Panel that coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in the action on this conditional remand order have been completed and that remand to the transferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 6/21/2019. (cc: attys) (kew) (Modified on 6/21/2019 to certify and replace image) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 56 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02325 - American Medical Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 1320 CTO-142, #2 Exhibit ECF 1358 P's Mtn & Brief to Vacate CTO, #3 Exhibit ECF 1378 AMS' Resp to Mtn to Vacate CTO, #4 Exhibit ECF 1388 Reply to Resp to Mtn to Vacate CTO)(Remington, Philipa) (Modified on 6/19/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 55 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Remington, Philipa) (Modified on 6/19/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND FOR CASE ON EXHIBIT A: Upon receipt of an order to remand from the Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and the timely filing of any joint designations of the MDL 2327 record by counsel in the individual case, the Clerk of this court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, is ORDERED that on 6/18/2019 the case identified on Exhibit A shall be remanded to Northern District of Texas; on or before 6/18/2019 the parties are ORDERED to confer and to file all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider, as more fully directed herein; any joint motion to dismiss may be ruled upon and any proper stipulation of dismissal may close a case prior to remand; on the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to utilize the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract the member case listed on Exhibit A if it remains pending and remand it to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas; after remand of the case on Exhibit A, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/11/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Case Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE ETHICON ENTITIES ONLY WITH PREJUDICE/ORDER Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. and Ethicon US, LLC only are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/6/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE ETHICON ENTITIES ONLY With Prejudice by Senaida Garcia, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Ethicon US, LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. (Boone, Alexandra) (Modified on 5/31/2019 to add party filer) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER (Dismissing Ethicon Defendants with Prejudice) granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice; the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the action(s) listed on the attached Exhibit(s) A; if no other defendants remain in an individual action, then (a) strike the action from the docket, and (b) close the case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on the attached Exhibit(s)) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 49 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Senaida Garcia. (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER (Dismissing Defendant American Medical Systems Entities with Prejudice) granting #47 JOINT MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc., Senaida Garcia to Dismiss Defendants American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and American Medical Systems Holding, Inc. with prejudice. Other defendants remain in this action, and plaintiff will continue to prosecute this action against them. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/23/2016. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 47 JOINT MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc., Senaida Garcia to Dismiss Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. With Prejudice (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER (Dismissing Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. with Prejudice and Transferring Cases to MDL 2327) Pending in MDL 2325, is a Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. with Prejudice filed by the plaintiffs, identified in Exhibits A-N, (attached hereto) and American Medical Systems, Inc., seeking dismissal of AMS as a defendant in these actions with prejudice and Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer MDLs. Because all claims against AMS have been compromised and settled, including all claims, counterclaims, cross-claims and third party claims, the Joint Motion to Dismiss AMS with Prejudice is GRANTED and the MOTION TO TRANSFER MDLs is GRANTED. To the extent Amended Short Form Complaints have not been filed, plaintiffs' counsel are DIRECTED to file the appropriate Amended Short Form Complaints within the time frame outlined in their Motion. Defendant AMS is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as a defendant in the actions listed in Exhibits A-N, these actions are TRANSFERRED to MDL 2327, and the Clerk is directed to disassociate these civil actions as member cases in MDL 2325 and re-associate them with MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/15/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibits A-N) (bdr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 17, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc.. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc.. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
March 18, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc.. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
March 6, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc.. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION by Senaida Garcia for Hearing on Plaintiff's #20 Motion to Remand to State Court (Weisbrod, Les) (Modified on 6/16/2014 to conform to filed document and remove link to Memorandum in Support) (cbo). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 38 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 182 (Final Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 06/10/2014 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern; Case Number 3:13-cv-04775. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 36 Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2325, and that order has now been filed in the US District Court of West Virginia. (cea) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
February 14, 2014 Filing 35 Appendix in Support filed by Senaida Garcia re #34 Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Lassiter, Lawrence) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
February 14, 2014 Filing 34 REPLY filed by Senaida Garcia re: #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Lassiter, Lawrence) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 31, 2014 Filing 33 Appendix in Support filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re #32 Response/Objection AMS Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 31, 2014 Filing 32 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re: #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 24, 2014 Filing 31 REPLY filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 24, 2014 Filing 30 REPLY filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc re: #12 MOTION to Sever , or in the Alternative, to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 24, 2014 Filing 29 REPLY filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc re: #10 MOTION to Stay (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 28 Appendix in Support filed by Senaida Garcia re #27 Response/Objection to Motion to Dismiss (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Senaida Garcia re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 26 Appendix in Support filed by Senaida Garcia re #25 Response/Objection to Motion to Stay (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Senaida Garcia re: #10 MOTION to Stay (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by Senaida Garcia re #23 Response/Objection to Motion to Sever (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Senaida Garcia re: #12 MOTION to Sever , or in the Alternative, to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Senaida Garcia re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #21 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Senaida Garcia re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Senaida Garcia (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall electronically file her response to defendants' motions (docket entries 7, 10, and 12) no later than 1/10/2014. Defendants shall electronically file their reply no later than 1/24/2014. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/3/2014) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 2, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence R Lassiter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lassiter, Lawrence) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
January 2, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #10 MOTION to Stay , #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MOTION to Sever , or in the Alternative, to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Senaida Garcia with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Unopposed Motion)) (Freeman, Max) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 18, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' #1 Notice of Removal filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) "A") (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 16, 2013 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Senaida Garcia. (Weisbrod, Les) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 16, 2013 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re #13 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION to Sever, or in the Alternative, to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Napoli, Michael) Modified filers on 12/17/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 16, 2013 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re #12 MOTION to Sever, or in the Alternative, to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Napoli, Michael) Modified filers on 12/17/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 16, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION to Sever, or in the Alternative, to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc (Napoli, Michael). Added MOTION on 12/17/2013 (jrr). Modified filers on 12/17/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 13, 2013 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re #10 MOTION to Stay (Napoli, Michael) Modified filers on 12/16/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 13, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc (Napoli, Michael) Modified filers on 12/16/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(f) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/13/2013) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 13, 2013 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Napoli, Michael) Modified filers on 12/16/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 13, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc. (Napoli, Michael) Modified filers on 12/16/2013 (jrr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The court's order dated 12/9/2013 (docket entry #4 ) is hereby VACATED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/10/2013) (cea) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 10, 2013 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:13-CV-4775-G. (gr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***VACATED PER ORDER AT DOCKET #6 *** STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2013. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/9/2013) (cea) Modified on 12/10/2013 (cea). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 6, 2013 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc. (See document #1 , Exhibit D for image) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 6, 2013 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Boyle. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 6, 2013 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]
December 6, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from Dallas County Court at Law No. 5, case number CC-13-06296-E filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, American Medical Systems Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-5727211) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C1, #4 Exhibit(s) C2, #5 Exhibit(s) C3, #6 Exhibit(s) C4, #7 Exhibit(s) C5, #8 Exhibit(s) C6, #9 Exhibit(s) C7, #10 Exhibit(s) C8, #11 Exhibit(s) C9, #12 Exhibit(s) C10, #13 Exhibit(s) C11, #14 Exhibit(s) C12, #15 Exhibit(s) C13, #16 Exhibit(s) C14, #17 Exhibit(s) C15, #18 Exhibit(s) C16, #19 Exhibit(s) C17, #20 Exhibit(s) C18, #21 Exhibit(s) C19, #22 Exhibit(s) C20, #23 Exhibit(s) C21, #24 Exhibit(s) C22, #25 Exhibit(s) C23, #26 Exhibit(s) C24, #27 Exhibit(s) C25, #28 Exhibit(s) C26, #29 Exhibit(s) C27, #30 Exhibit(s) C28, #31 Exhibit(s) C29, #32 Exhibit(s) C30, #33 Exhibit(s) C31, #34 Exhibit(s) C32, #35 Exhibit(s) C33, #36 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons, #37 Exhibit(s) E -- Petition, #38 Exhibit(s) F -- Consent, #39 Cover Sheet) (Napoli, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/10/2014.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Marie-Blanche Nana Tchetgen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Phamaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra C. Zamora
Represented By: Jane E Bockus
Represented By: Steven G Reade
Represented By: Angel L. Tang
Represented By: Julie A Hardin
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Represented By: Tracy G. Weiss
Represented By: Angel L Tang
Represented By: Tracy G Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery Inc
Represented By: David R Noteware
Represented By: Janelle L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies Inc
Represented By: David R Noteware
Represented By: Janelle L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urology Associates of North Texas PLLC
Represented By: Cathryn R Paton
Represented By: Philipa M Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Sandra C. Zamora
Represented By: Jane E Bockus
Represented By: Steven G Reade
Represented By: Angel L. Tang
Represented By: Julie A Hardin
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Represented By: Tracy G. Weiss
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Erik W Legg
Represented By: Angel L Tang
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Tracy G Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Solutions Inc
Represented By: Sandra C. Zamora
Represented By: Jane E Bockus
Represented By: Steven G Reade
Represented By: Angel L. Tang
Represented By: Julie A Hardin
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Represented By: Tracy G. Weiss
Represented By: Angel L Tang
Represented By: Tracy G Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: David R Noteware
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Janelle L Davis
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie-Blanche Tchetgen MD PA
Represented By: Cathryn R Paton
Represented By: Philipa M Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon US LLC
Represented By: David R Noteware
Represented By: Janelle L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Holdings Inc
Represented By: Sandra C. Zamora
Represented By: Jane E Bockus
Represented By: Steven G Reade
Represented By: Angel L. Tang
Represented By: Julie A Hardin
Represented By: Michael D Napoli
Represented By: Tracy G. Weiss
Represented By: Angel L Tang
Represented By: Tracy G Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie-Blanche Nana Tchetgen
Represented By: Cathryn R Paton
Represented By: Philipa M Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senaida Garcia
Represented By: Les Weisbrod
Represented By: Alexandra V Boone
Represented By: Lawrence R Lassiter
Represented By: Max E Freeman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?