Zarate v. Brown County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Micheal J Zarate
Defendant: Officer Doe, Brown County Sheriff's Department, John Doe, Captian Doe and NFN Dunn
Case Number: 3:2019cv01489
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Case copied to 1:19cv0146-C. Transfer to Abilene Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm)
June 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Jun 27 14:51:24 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims arise out of events that occurred at the Brown County Jail. Brown County is located in the Abilene Division of the Northern District of Texas. 28 U.S.C. 124. The Court finds the Abilene Division is a more convenient forum. Accordingly, this case is hereby transferred to the Abilene Division pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/27/2019) (aaa)
June 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Jun 27 09:42:17 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as to Micheal J Zarate #2153751. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/26/2019) (rekc)
June 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Jun 25 08:56:40 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Micheal J Zarate. (axm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Micheal J Zarate. (axm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Brown County Sheriff's Department, Captian Doe, NFN Dunn, John Doe, Officer Doe filed by Micheal J Zarate. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarate v. Brown County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captian Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal J Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?