Edgefield Holdings LLC v. Einbinder & Dunn LLP
Plaintiff: Edgefield Holdings, LLC, assignee and successor-in-interest to The Learning Experience Systems, LLC and Edgefield Holdings LLC
Defendant: Einbinder & Dunn, L.L.P. and Einbinder & Dunn LLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv01495
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant must file its answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 13, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/20/2019) (chmb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Other Responsive Pleading filed by Einbinder & Dunn LLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hauder, Bernie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Einbinder & Dunn LLP; served on 7/1/2019. (rekc) Modified date served on 7/24/2019 (zkc).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant must file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before August 23, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/16/2019) (chmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer And/Or Other Responsive Pleadings filed by Einbinder & Dunn LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Bernie E Hauder added to party Einbinder & Dunn LLP(pty:dft) (Hauder, Bernie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Einbinder & Dunn LLP. (zkc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Edgefield Holdings, LLC, assignee and successor-in-interest to The Learning Experience Systems, LLC. (Gameros, Charles)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Einbinder & Dunn, L.L.P. filed by Edgefield Holdings, LLC, assignee and successor-in-interest to The Learning Experience Systems, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10071831) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Final Judgment S.D. Fla., #2 Exhibit(s) B - Order Granting Motion to Certify, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Certified Abstract of Judgment N.D. Tex., #4 Exhibit(s) D - Motion for Charging Order N.D. Tex., #5 Exhibit(s) E - Agreed Charging Order N.D. Tex., #6 Exhibit(s) F - Ourtbound Wire to Einbinder Dunn, #7 Exhibit(s) G - Final Judgment on Attys Fees S.D. Fla., #8 Cover Sheet) (Gameros, Charles) Modified on 6/25/2019 to add filing fee & receipt number (zkc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgefield Holdings LLC v. Einbinder & Dunn LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Einbinder & Dunn, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Einbinder & Dunn LLP
Represented By: Bernie E Hauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgefield Holdings, LLC, assignee and successor-in-interest to The Learning Experience Systems, LLC
Represented By: Charles W Gameros, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgefield Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles W Gameros, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?