Murphy v. Dallas County Jail Facility
Plaintiff: Lataurus Murphy
Defendant: Dallas County Jail Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv01501
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Aug 22 11:31:34 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's complaint should be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/21/2019) (axm)
June 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 5. Tue Jun 25 13:51:32 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Lataurus Murphy must address the following deficiency: The $400 fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. A request to proceed in forma pauperis must include a certified statement of the balance in plaintiff's inmate trust account for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/25/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (zkc)
June 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,4. Mon Jun 24 17:23:55 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The complaint of Freddie Washington shall continue under this Civil Action No. 3:19-cv-1436-C (BT). The complaints of the remaining Plaintiffs shall be SEVERED into separate action as to each Plaintiff, with a new cause number being assigned to each Plaintiff. In each of the new civil actions, the Clerk shall file a copy of this Order and the Complaint (Doc. #3 ) in this case. Each of the new civil actions shall be directly assigned to District Judge Cummings and Magistrate Judge Rutherford. Plaintiffs (except for Plaintiff Freddie Washington) shall, within thirty days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file with the Clerk a signed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Clerk shall mail to each of the Plaintiffs (other than Plaintiff Freddie Washington), an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization marked with the new cause number assigned to their respective new complaint for their use in complying with this Order. (Civil actions 3:19-cv-1497, 3:19-cv-1498, 3:19-cv-1499, 3:19-cv-1500, 3:19-cv-1501, 3:19-cv-1502, 3:19-cv-1503, 3:19-cv-1504, 3:19-cv-1505, 3:19-cv-1506, 3:19-cv-1507, 3:19-cv-1508, 3:19-cv-1509, 3:19-cv-1510, 3:19-cv-1511, 3:19-cv-1512, 3:19-cv-1513, 3:19-cv-1514, 3:19-cv-1515, 3:19-cv-1516, 3:19-cv-1517, 3:19-cv-1518, 3:19-cv-1519 opened.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/24/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (axm)
June 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue Jun 18 11:13:43 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Dallas County Jail Facility filed by Freddie Washington. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) Modified on 6/18/2019 (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Dallas County Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lataurus Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?