Ramirez et al v. City of Arlington Texas et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Anthony Olivas and Selina Marie Ramirez
Defendant: Ebony N. Jefferson, Jeremias Guadarrama, City of Arlington, Texas, City of Arlington Texas and Ebony N Jefferson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01529
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, filed by Jeremias Guadarrama. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Voss, Edwin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeremias Guadarrama with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Voss, Edwin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Lee Martin on behalf of Jeremias Guadarrama. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Martin, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Arlington Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Fugate, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, filed by Ebony N Jefferson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Levine, Scott)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ebony N Jefferson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Levine, Scott)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Gabriel Anthony Olivas, Selina Marie Ramirez re: #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Malone, T)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Selina Marie Ramirez, Gabriel Anthony Olivas. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Malone, T)
July 26, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeremias Guadarrama. (Voss, Edwin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jeremias Guadarrama. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Voss, Edwin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeremias Guadarrama with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Voss, Edwin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ebony N Jefferson. (Levine, Scott)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ebony N Jefferson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Levine, Scott)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ebony N Jefferson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Scott D Levine added to party Ebony N Jefferson(pty:dft) (Levine, Scott)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Jeremias Guadarrama to answer or otherwise plead is 7/26/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/19/2019) (chmb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jeremias Guadarrama Attorney Edwin P Voss, Jr added to party Jeremias Guadarrama(pty:dft) (Voss, Edwin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Arlington Texas. (Fugate, Robert) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened image on 7/18/2019) (ajb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Arlington Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Robert H Fugate added to party City of Arlington Texas(pty:dft) (Fugate, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ebony N Jefferson; served on 7/9/2019. (Malone, T)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ebony N Jefferson ; served on 7/5/2019. (Malone, T)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jeremias Guadarrama ; served on 7/1/2019. (Malone, T)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Arlington Texas ; served on 6/28/2019. (Malone, T)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Arlington, Texas, Jeremias Guadarrama, Ebony N. Jefferson. (rekc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gabriel Anthony Olivas, Selina Marie Ramirez. (Malone, T)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Selina Marie Ramirez, Gabriel Anthony Olivas. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10075139) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Malone, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. City of Arlington Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony N. Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremias Guadarrama
Represented By: Edwin P Voss, Jr
Represented By: Michael Lee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arlington, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Arlington Texas
Represented By: Robert H Fugate
Represented By: Cynthia Withers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebony N Jefferson
Represented By: Scott D Levine
Represented By: Baxter W Banowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Anthony Olivas
Represented By: Michael T O'Connor
Represented By: T Dean Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selina Marie Ramirez
Represented By: Michael T O'Connor
Represented By: T Dean Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?