Ochoa v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Jesusita C Ochoa
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01552
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from the Court to Counsel Regarding Settlement; dismissal papers due by 9/9/2019. (Signed by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (mla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Davidoff, Bill)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 8/5/2019. Joint Report due by 8/12/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/22/2019) (ykp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Bill E. Davidoff added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Davidoff, Bill)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (ajb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jesusita C Ochoa. (Guerrini, Bernard)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America filed by Jesusita C Ochoa. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10081415) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Guerrini, Bernard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/27/2019) (ajb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesusita C Ochoa
Represented By: Bernard A Guerrini
Represented By: John L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bill E. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?