Johnson v. Credit Systems International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Renee Johnson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Credit Systems International Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01557
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 8/20/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris R Miltenberger on behalf of Renee Johnson. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Miltenberger, Chris)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/2/2019) (zkc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Credit Systems International Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC. (svc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Renee Johnson. (Motil, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Credit Systems International, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Renee Johnson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10082050) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Motil, Gregory) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (svc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Credit Systems International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Systems International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Motil
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?