Habibullah v. Chief of Dallas Police Dept
Plaintiff: Abdulhakim Habibullah
Defendant: Chief of Dallas Police Dept
Case Number: 3:2019cv01558
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Tue Aug 13 14:13:49 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/13/2019) (chmb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party, #1 Consent Form, received back from Abdulhakim Habibullah as RTS. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (epm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Mail returned as undeliverable. 5 Order And Notice of Deficiency, received back from Abdulhakim Habibullah as RTS. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (epm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Ticket filed by Abdulhakim Habibullah. (mla)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Immediate Action filed by Abdulhakim Habibullah. (aaa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abdulhakim Habibullah. (zkc)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff Abdulhakim Habibullah must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff did not pay the required filing and administrative fees of $400.00 or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis on the court approved form. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915(a). Further, a review of the docket reveals that Plaintiff has not yet registered as a user of the Courts electronic filing system, as required. Instructions for registering are found online at https://ecf.txnd.uscourts.gov/AttorneyReg/. Therefore, by 7/19/2019, Plaintiff is ORDERED to (1) pay the required $400.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 form, and (2) register to use the Court's electronic filing system. PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). A motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 form is available online at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/AO239_0.pdf. No process will issue unless ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/28/2019) (chmb)
June 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Jun 27 16:03:12 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abdulhakim Habibullah (ajb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Chief of Dallas Police Dept filed by Abdulhakim Habibullah. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ajb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ajb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habibullah v. Chief of Dallas Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulhakim Habibullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Dallas Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?