Newman v. National Credit Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Debra Newman
Defendant: Surrey Row Apartments and National Credit Systems Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01560
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Credit Systems Inc. (Bowdich, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Credit Systems Inc. (Bowdich, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by National Credit Systems Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John W Bowdich, II added to party National Credit Systems Inc(pty:dft) (Bowdich, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Credit Systems Inc ; served on 7/9/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Surrey Row Apartments; served on 6/28/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Credit Systems Inc, Surrey Row Apartments. (zkc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Debra Newman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10082889) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. National Credit Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surrey Row Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Systems Inc
Represented By: John W Bowdich, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Newman
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?