Garrett v. Esser et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Dione Webster Garrett
Defendant: Caroltta Lowe, Rick Esser, Carlotta Gordon, Washington County, Russell Vaclaw, Brian Gordon, Brian Huddleston, B David Gambill and Rick Silver
Case Number: 3:2019cv01567
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shirley Dione Webster Garrett (rekc)
August 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Fri Aug 9 16:19:10 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, as no answer or summary judgment has been filed, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as a matter of course without the necessity of a court order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/9/2019) (axm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Shirley Dione Webster Garrett. (zkc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Shirley Dione Webster Garrett. (ykp)
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Jul 31 15:20:46 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford for pretrial management. All nondispositive motions, pending or prospective, are referred to the magistrate judge for determination. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/31/2019) (ndt)
July 2, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,4. Tue Jul 2 10:08:51 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (epm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rick Esser, B David Gambill, Brian Gordon, Brian Huddleston, Caroltta Lowe, Rick Silver, Russell Vaclaw, Washington County. (aaa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Rick Esser, B David Gambill, Brian Gordon, Brian Huddleston, Caroltta Lowe, Rick Silver, Russell Vaclaw, Washington County filed by Shirley Dione Webster Garrett. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DS0117173) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Esser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroltta Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Esser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlotta Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Vaclaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B David Gambill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Dione Webster Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?