Richard v. Zabojnik et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Richard
Defendant: Randall Zabojnik, City of Carrollton and Rodney Stovall
Case Number: 3:2019cv01568
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: #14 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/30/2019) filed by City of Carrollton, Rodney Stovall, Randall Zabojnik (Brandt, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to order dated 7/30/2019) filed by Cornelius Richard (Roberts, James)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - QUALIFIED IMMUNITY: Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/30/2019) (ykp)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randall Zabojnik. (Sileo, Caroline)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Randall Zabojnik. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas P Brandt added to party Randall Zabojnik(pty:dft) (Brandt, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rodney Stovall. (Husted, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Rodney Stovall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas P Brandt added to party Rodney Stovall(pty:dft) (Brandt, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Carrollton. (Husted, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by City of Carrollton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brandt, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Randall Zabojnik; served on 7/9/2019. (zkc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rodney Stovall, served on 7/4/2019; City of Carrollton, served on 7/3/2019. (zkc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Carrollton, Rodney Stovall, Randall Zabojnik. (axm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits by Cornelius Richard re #1 Complaint. Plaintiff's Exhibits B & C in Support of Plaintiff's Original Complaint (Roberts, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cornelius Richard. (Roberts, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Cornelius Richard. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10084114) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit D) (Roberts, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Zabojnik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Zabojnik
Represented By: Caroline Sileo
Represented By: John D Husted
Represented By: Thomas P Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Carrollton
Represented By: Caroline Sileo
Represented By: John D Husted
Represented By: Thomas P Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Stovall
Represented By: Caroline Sileo
Represented By: John D Husted
Represented By: Thomas P Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Richard
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Represented By: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?