Williams v. City of Dallas Police et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Whigham Williams
Defendant: City of Dallas Police, Medical City Hospital, Texas Department of Family Protective Services and Marsh McLennan Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv01587
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6, 7. Tue Aug 20 15:00:26 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this case with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and issue an appropriate vexatious litigant warning. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/20/2019) (zkc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/20/2019) (zkc)
July 2, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,5. Tue Jul 2 09:23:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (svc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elaine Whigham Williams. (svc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Dallas Police, Marsh McLennan Companies, Medical City Hospital, Texas Department of Family Protective Services filed by Elaine Whigham Williams. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 Summons) (svc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Dallas Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical City Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Family Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh McLennan Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Whigham Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?