Fitzgerald v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carol Fitzgerald
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01597
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case will be decided on the papers. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2019. Motions due by 6/17/2020. All Fact and Expert Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 12/9/2019. Pretrial Order due by 8/17/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 8/17/2020. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/16/2019) (zkc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Jean, Cameron)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Carol Fitzgerald. Related document: #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Guerrini, Bernard)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), Rule 26, and the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan (the "Plan"), the Court enters this Order to promote possible early settlement of this action and to facilitate subsequent entry of a Scheduling Order. Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/25/2019) (ndt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate StanCorp Financial Group Inc. for Standard Insurance Company. (McComber, Ryan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Standard Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Carol Fitzgerald filed by Standard Insurance CompanyAttorney Ryan Kent McComber added to party Standard Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McComber, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (svc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carol Fitzgerald. (Guerrini, Bernard)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company filed by Carol Fitzgerald. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10091373) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Guerrini, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Fitzgerald
Represented By: Bernard A Guerrini
Represented By: John L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Kent McComber
Represented By: Cameron Elliot Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?