Karcher North America, Inc v. Tornado Industries LLC
Plaintiff: Krcher North America, Inc., a Delaware corporation and Karcher North America Inc
Defendant: Tornado Industries LLC, an Illinois corporation, d/b/a Tornado Industries, Inc. and also d/b/a Tornado Industries and Tornado Industries LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01643
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Exemption From Local Rule 83.10(a). The Court may at anytime require local counsel to make an appearance in this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/7/2019) (chmb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Supplemental Certificate of Conference re: #9 MOTION filed by Karcher North America, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Smith, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Exemption from Local Rule 83.10(a) filed by Karcher North America, Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael) Modified title on 7/31/2019 (awc).
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Karcher North America, Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Siebman, Clyde)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Karcher North America, Inc., shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/10/2019) (chmb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 (Document Restricted) Attorney Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Karcher North America, Inc (Smith, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Judge Ed Kinkeade added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Sam A Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (rekc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tornado Industries LLC. (rekc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Krcher North America, Inc., a Delaware corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Alfred Karcher GmbH Co. KG, a German corporation for Krcher North America, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Smith, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tornado Industries LLC filed by Krcher North America, Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10104150) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Cover Sheet) (Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karcher North America, Inc v. Tornado Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tornado Industries LLC, an Illinois corporation, d/b/a Tornado Industries, Inc. and also d/b/a Tornado Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tornado Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krcher North America, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Michael C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karcher North America Inc
Represented By: Michael C Smith
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?