Homeland Security v. Diaysis Institute
Plaintiff: Homeland Security
Defendant: Diaysis Institute
Case Number: 3:2019cv01648
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue Aug 27 08:58:07 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation re: an #5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the application should be denied, and the case should be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute or follow orders of the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/26/2019) (mcrd)
July 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Fri Jul 12 13:46:58 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Homeland Security must address the following deficiency: Before the Court is an unsigned Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/12/2019) (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt)
July 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Thu Jul 11 10:52:46 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Homeland Security. (zkc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Homeland Security. (zkc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Diaysis Institute filed by Homeland Security. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homeland Security v. Diaysis Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaysis Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?