Jeffery v. Choudry

Plaintiff: Jalelisa Jeffery
Defendant: Yasin M Choudry
Case Number: 3:2019cv01649
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. #11 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The Court will enter a separate final judgment as to Defendant Lone Star PJS. The Clerk of the Court is directed to sever Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Choudry from this case and assign a new case number to the severed action. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint in the severed action. Civil case 3:19-cv-1649-M opened. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/10/2019) (zkc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn: Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment held on July 1, 2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff Jesse Forester; Defense N/A. (Court Reporter: Debbie Kriegshauser). Time on the Record 0:20. (chmb)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Hearing on #11 MOTION for Default Judgment reset for 7/1/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/4/2019) (zkc)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The hearing set for 6/3/2019, at 1:00 p.m. on Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. #11 ) is CANCELED. The Court will enter a separate order resetting the hearing. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/23/2019) (zkc)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Hearing on #11 MOTION for Default Judgment reset for 6/3/2019 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/1/2019) (zkc)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Hearing on #11 MOTION for Default Judgment reset for 5/14/2019 04:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/15/2019) (zkc)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Hearing on #11 MOTION for Default Judgment set for 5/10/2019 01:00 PM before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/10/2019) (zkc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Jalelisa Jeffery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Forester, Jesse)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: That by 3/19/2019, Plaintiff move for default judgement. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case against Defendants without prejudice for want of prosecution without further notice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/5/2019) (zkc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lone Star PJS LLC, Yasin M Choudry. (zkc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Jalelisa Jeffery (Forester, Jesse) Modified docket text on 2/11/2019 (zkc).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By 2/13/2019, Plaintiff must show cause in writing why he has not moved for an entry of default against Defendants, or, alternatively, Plaintiff may file a motion for entry of default with the Clerk's office per Rule 55(a) and, if successful, file a motion for default judgment with the Court under Rule 55(b). Failure to show cause or file the appropriate documents may result in dismissal of this case against Defendants without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/30/2019) (zkc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lone Star PJS LLC; served on 11/14/2018. (Forester, Jesse)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Yasin M Choudry; served on 11/14/2018. (Forester, Jesse)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Yasin M Choudry, Lone Star PJS LLC. (zkc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JALELISA JEFFERY. (Forester, Jesse)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by JALELISA JEFFERY. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9554021) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Jeffery consent) (Forester, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffery v. Choudry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasin M Choudry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalelisa Jeffery
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?