Clark v. Kroger Texas LP et al
Plaintiff: Fannie Clark
Defendant: Kroger Texas L P, ADR Provider, Henpil Inc and Kroger Texas LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv01663
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 9/14/2020 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2020. Motions due by 4/15/2020. Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/6/2019) (axm)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties in this case appeared before the Court through counsel for a scheduling conference hearing on August 8, 2019. Pursuant to the Court's instructions at the scheduling conference, the parties were required to either submit an agreed proposed scheduling order or contact the Court. At this time, the Court is not in receipt of any proposed scheduling order. The Court orders the parties to submit their proposed scheduling order by September 3, 2019. If the parties cannot come to an agreement, the parties should each submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's review by such date. Proposed orders must be emailed in Microsoft Word format to Scholer_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/27/2019) (chmb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Kroger Texas LP (Zimlich Miranda, Hope)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints James J Juneau as mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/8/2019) (rekc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kristina N. Kastl; Defense - Hope Zimlich Miranda. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :21. (chmb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order by Kroger Texas LP. (Zimlich Miranda, Hope)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Kroger Texas LP. (Zimlich Miranda, Hope)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Kimbrough Scudday on behalf of Kroger Texas LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scudday, Sara)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/15/2019) (aaa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kroger Texas L.P. d/b/a Henpil #517, Kroger Texas L.P. d/b/a Kroger #517. (Zimlich Miranda, Hope)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 116th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-08147 filed by Kroger Texas LP, Kroger Texas LP, Henpil Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10111047.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) Modified on 7/12/2019 (ndt). Modified parties on 7/15/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Kroger Texas LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Clark
Represented By: Kristina N Kastl
Represented By: Heather Victoria Banahan Nease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Texas L P
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Represented By: Hope Zimlich Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADR Provider
Represented By: James J Juneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henpil Inc
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Represented By: Hope Zimlich Miranda
Represented By: Sara Kimbrough Scudday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Texas LP
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Represented By: Hope Zimlich Miranda
Represented By: Sara Kimbrough Scudday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?