Wafer v. QuikTrip Corporation
Plaintiff: Exavia Wafer
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01665
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***DISREGARD*** SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020. Motions due by 7/21/2020. Discovery due by 6/21/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/22/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/29/2019) (mla) Modified on 8/29/2019 (mla).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2020. Motions due by 7/21/2020. Discovery due by 6/21/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/22/2020. Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/29/2019) (aaa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/15/2019) (ndt)
July 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Fri Jul 12 16:23:39 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 2, Dallas County, case number CC-19-03374-B filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10111191) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wafer v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exavia Wafer
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Kinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Nicolas Michael Lund
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?