Brockie et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Donovan, Robert Brockie and The House Of Glunz Inc
Defendant: Adrian Bentley Nettles, Ken Paxton and Gregory Abbott
Case Number: 3:2019cv01675
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James A. Tanford. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/5/2019) (chmb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10163877) filed by Robert Brockie, Christopher Donovan, The House Of Glunz Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney James A Tanford added to party Robert Brockie(pty:pla), Attorney James A Tanford added to party Christopher Donovan(pty:pla), Attorney James A Tanford added to party The House Of Glunz Inc(pty:pla) (Tanford, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gregory Abbott, Adrian Bentley Nettles, Ken Paxton. (ndt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Robert Brockie, Christopher Donovan, The House Of Glunz Inc. (Gappelberg, Rodney)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Brockie, Christopher Donovan, The House Of Glunz Inc. (Gappelberg, Rodney)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory Abbott, Adrian Bentley Nettles, Ken Paxton filed by Robert Brockie, The House Of Glunz Inc, Christopher Donovan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10112832) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gappelberg, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brockie et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Donovan
Represented By: Rodney J Gappelberg
Represented By: Robert D Epstein
Represented By: James A Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brockie
Represented By: Rodney J Gappelberg
Represented By: Robert D Epstein
Represented By: James A Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The House Of Glunz Inc
Represented By: Rodney J Gappelberg
Represented By: Robert D Epstein
Represented By: James A Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Bentley Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?