Pilot Inc v. Schumacher Electric Corporation
Plaintiff: Pilot, Inc. and Pilot Inc
Defendant: Schumacher Electric Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01676
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Pilot, Inc.'s action against Schumacher Electric Corporation be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/6/2019) (ndt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pilot Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron P. Bradford. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2019) (chmb)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex W. Ruge. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2019) (chmb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Aaron P. Bradford (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10204009; paid at document 10) filed by Pilot Inc (Attachments: #1 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Arizona Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Bradford, Aaron) Modified on 8/22/2019 (twd).
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Alex W. Ruge (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10204066; paid at document #11 ) filed by Pilot Inc (Attachments: #1 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ruge, Alex) Docket text modified on 8/21/2019 (twd).
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Alex Ruge (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10204066) filed by Pilot Inc (Attachments: #1 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Alex Ruge added to party Pilot Inc(pty:pla) (Ruge, Alex)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Aaron Bradford (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10204009) filed by Pilot Inc (Attachments: #1 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Arizona Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Aaron Patrick Bradford added to party Pilot Inc(pty:pla) (Bradford, Aaron)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Defendants response to the complaint is due September 9, 2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/12/2019) (chmb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION of Service and Time to Respond by Pilot Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Proof of Service) (Smith, Michael) Modified on 8/12/2019 to add gavel (ctf).
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Schumacher Electric Corporation, served on 7/18/2019. (Smith, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Schumacher Electric Corporation. (ykp)
July 15, 2019 Judge David C Godbey added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Pilot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pilot Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Pilot Holdings Inc for Pilot Inc. (Smith, Michael) Modified to add corporate parent on 7/15/2019 (ykp).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Schumacher Electric Corporation filed by Pilot, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10112872) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s)) (Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilot Inc v. Schumacher Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumacher Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilot, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilot Inc
Represented By: Michael C Smith
Represented By: Aaron Patrick Bradford
Represented By: Alex W Ruge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?