Martinez v. QuikTrip Corporation
Plaintiff: Jeancarlo Martinez
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01683
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/31/2020. Motions due by 6/30/2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/15/2019) (mcrd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Scheduling Conference held on 8/15/2019. Order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Stephanie B Sherman; Defense - B Kyle Briscoe. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :03. (mcrd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Control Plan filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/25/2019) (mcrd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING 26(F) REPORT AND SETTING 16(B) CONFERENCE: Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel must confer in person not later than August 7, 2019. By August 12, 2019, the parties must submit a joint written Rule 26(f) report containing a proposed discovery plan. On August 15, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., the Court will conduct a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) pretrial scheduling conference in Courtroom 1561, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 before United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/25/2019) (mcrd)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/24/2019) (chmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 162nd Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-06154 filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10114523) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation
Represented By: Nicolas Michael Lund
Represented By: B Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeancarlo Martinez
Represented By: R Nash Thomas
Represented By: Alexander Grier Dwyer, Sr.
Represented By: Stephanie B Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?