Davis v. Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc
Plaintiff: Latoya M Davis
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01690
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Thu Sep 12 15:31:03 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/17/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/12/2019) (ndt)
September 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Thu Sep 12 15:27:54 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 2/1/2021 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 3/30/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2020. Motions due by 9/15/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Pretrial Order due by 1/4/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 1/4/2021. Status Report due by 12/10/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/12/2019) (ndt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Reilley, Steven)
September 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Fri Sep 6 11:27:30 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court orders Defendant to submit an explanation discussing why it is opposed to #9 MOTION to Dismiss no later than 9/13/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/6/2019) (epm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Latoya M Davis re #9 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Latoya M Davis. (ndt)
August 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) NEF of 7 Thu Aug 8 12:22:05 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Aug 8 12:17:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/8/2019) (aaa)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion. Accordingly, Defendants may proceed without designating local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/7/2019) (chmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Pershing Square Holdings Ltd for Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Reilley, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION For Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc (Reilley, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Reilley, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Reilley, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10116622) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Reilley, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc
Represented By: Peter Thompson
Represented By: Steven Scott Reilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya M Davis
Represented By: Christopher R Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?