Sisvel International SA et al v. ZTE (USA) Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sisvel International S.A., 3G Licensing S.A., 3G Licensing SA and Sisvel International SA
Defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc and ZTE Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01694
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil A. Benchell. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2019) (chmb)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy Devlin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2019) (chmb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ZTE (USA) Inc. Waiver sent on 7/31/2019. (Devlin, Timothy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10198693) filed by 3G Licensing SA, Sisvel International SA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Sanding, #2 Proposed Order) (Benchell, Neil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10198645) filed by 3G Licensing SA, Sisvel International SA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Devlin, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (rekc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ZTE (USA) Inc, ZTE Corporation. (rekc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3G Licensing SA, Sisvel International SA identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Fineur International SA for Sisvel International SA. (Helms, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Sisvel International SA, 3G Licensing SA. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10117138) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Helms, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisvel International SA et al v. ZTE (USA) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisvel International S.A.
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3G Licensing S.A.
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3G Licensing SA
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Represented By: Neil A Benchell
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisvel International SA
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Represented By: Neil A Benchell
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?