Quinones Jr v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Leonides Quinones Jr
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2019cv01697
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Sep 12 11:07:03 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: the petitioner's #5 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. On 9/11/2019, the petitioner's filing fee was received. The Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is therefore DEEMED MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/12/2019) (mcrd)
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Jul 31 16:04:03 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: the petitioner's #5 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The petitioner is granted THIRTY days from the date of this order to pay the required $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk of the Court. If he does not, denial of leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be recommended, and this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/31/2019) (mcrd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Leonides Quinones Jr. (ndt)
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Thu Jul 18 10:34:51 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Leonides Quinones Jr must address the following deficiency: The $5.00 filing fee has not been paid nor has a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/18/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (ykp)
July 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3. Wed Jul 17 09:57:50 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Leonides Quinones Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones Jr v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonides Quinones Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?