Brown v. Underwood
Petitioner: Daniel Brown
Respondent: NFN Underwood
Case Number: 3:2019cv01706
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Public correspondence addressed to judge, received from Daniel Brown. (axm)
August 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Aug 22 16:51:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court should dismiss Petitioner Daniel Brown's request for compassionate release for lack of jurisdiction and should deny his alternative request for court-ordered release to a halfway house. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/22/2019) (aaa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Daniel Brown. (zkc)
July 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Jul 17 10:03:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NFN Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?