Pacheco v. Bottled Blonde Dallas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicolas Pacheco
Defendant: Eldin Kandzetovic, Bottled Blonde Dallas, LLC and Bottled Blonde Dallas LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01752
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Assault, Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF NICHOLAS PACHECOS' RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Nicolas Pacheco. Party Nicholas Pacheco added. (Fortenberry, Zeke) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (ykp).
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental Notice of Removal by Bottled Blonde Dallas LLC . (Shackelford, Nathan) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (rekc).
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Defendant, Eldin Kandzetovic's Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Eldin Kandzetovic (Colaneri, Janet)
August 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 9. Fri Aug 30 15:19:14 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 9/21/2020 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/30/2019) (zkc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT filed by Bottled Blonde Dallas LLC, Eldin Kandzetovic. (Shackelford, Nathan)
July 30, 2019 ***Please Disregard - entered in error Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. re-mailed. Address updated from document 22 Tue Jul 30 10:44:10 CDT 2019 (crt) Modified on 7/30/2019 (axm).
July 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Jul 29 14:42:40 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/29/2019) (rekc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eldin Kandzetovic. (Colaneri, Janet)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by Eldin Kandzetovic (Colaneri, Janet)
July 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 4. Re-mail with new address Wed Jul 24 09:38:06 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Jul 23 12:35:59 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/23/2019) (ndt) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (mla).
July 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Tue Jul 23 08:40:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bottled Blonde Dallas, LLC. (for image please see doc. #1 ) (ndt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 162nd Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-07485 filed by Bottled Blonde Dallas, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10133653) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Index of State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit(s) B-1, #4 Exhibit(s) B-2, #5 Exhibit(s) B-3, #6 Exhibit(s) B-4, #7 Exhibit(s) B-5, #8 Exhibit(s) B-6, #9 Exhibit(s) B-7, #10 Exhibit(s) B-8, #11 Exhibit(s) B-9, #12 Exhibit(s) C- Certificate of Interested Persons, #13 Cover Sheet, #14 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Shackelford, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco v. Bottled Blonde Dallas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldin Kandzetovic
Represented By: Janet K Colaneri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottled Blonde Dallas, LLC
Represented By: Nathan W Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bottled Blonde Dallas LLC
Represented By: Nathan W Shackelford
Represented By: Christopher C Carter
Represented By: Adam B Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Pacheco
Represented By: Zeke Fortenberry
Represented By: Zeke O Fortenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?