Nerium Biotechnology Inc et al v. Neora LLC
Plaintiff: Nerium Biotechnology Inc and Nerium SkinCare Inc
Defendant: Neora LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01753
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' notice of dismissal under Rule 41(a) (Doc. 12), this case has been dismissed. The Court directs the clerk to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/13/2019) (chmb)
August 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per 13 Electronic Order. (aaa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Nerium Biotechnology Inc, Nerium SkinCare Inc (Wilson, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF COURTS INTENT TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTER: The Court hereby gives the parties notice of the Court's intent to appoint Judge Kaplan as special master of this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 53(b)(1). The parties have seven (7) days from the date of this order to file any objections to the choice of Judge Kaplan as special master. After that time, the Court will decide whether appointing Judge Kaplan is warranted and, if so, will issue an order under Rule 53 to that effect. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/12/2019) (axm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane J. Boyle for all further proceedings. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/5/2019) (zkc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Neora LLC re #8 Response/Objection to Application for TRO (Latin, Monica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Neora LLC re: 5 Order. (Latin, Monica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Neora LLC (Latin, Monica)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Neora LLC, served on 7/25/2019. (mla)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court has reviewed footnote 25 on page 54 of Plaintiffs' Complaint. The Court allows Plaintiffs to notify Defendant's counsel via hand-delivery and email of this proceeding and the Temporary Restraining Order request. Defendant shall have seven (7) days to submit a written response after receiving such notice. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/26/2019) (chmb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nerium Biotechnology Inc, Nerium SkinCare Inc. (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Neora LLC. (epm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neora, LLC filed by Nerium Biotechnology, Inc., Nerium SkinCare Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10134351) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3) (Wilson, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nerium Biotechnology Inc et al v. Neora LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nerium Biotechnology Inc
Represented By: Michael S Gardner
Represented By: Jeremy R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nerium SkinCare Inc
Represented By: Michael S Gardner
Represented By: Jeremy R Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neora LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Edwin Carroll
Represented By: Parker Lee Graham
Represented By: Monica Wiseman Latin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?