Harper v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: James Vernon Harper, Jr
Respondent: NFN Hefner and Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2019cv01768
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Fri Sep 20 14:50:45 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. The Court should dismiss the application for a writ of habeas corpus with prejudice because it is time barred. The Court should direct that the Clerk of Court serve any order accepting this recommendation on the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/20/2019) (aaa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by James Vernon Harper, Jr re: #7 Judge's Questionnaire. (sre)
September 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Sep 17 09:40:41 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS CONCLUSION for Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. James Vernon Harper Jr shall pay $5.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/16/2019) (ndt)
August 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6, 7. Tue Aug 20 13:38:18 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Judge's Questionnaire sent to James Vernon Harper, Jr. Responses due by 9/20/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/20/2019) (zkc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should deny Petitioner James Vernon Harper, Jr. leave to proceed in forma pauperis and order that he pay the $5.00 filing fee within 21 days of any order accepting this recommendation (or within some other reasonable time to be set by the Court), and, if he fails to do so, the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) without further notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 8/20/2019) (zkc)
July 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Jul 26 09:53:03 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Vernon Harper, Jr (ykp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by James Vernon Harper, Jr re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ykp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Vernon Harper, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Vernon Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NFN Hefner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?