Study Logic LLC v. Farmer Bros Co
Plaintiff: Study Logic LLC
Defendant: Farmer Bros. Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01802
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01645. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM&ORDER, Since this Court lacks general and specific jurisdiction over Farmer Bros., Defendant's #12 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue is granted. However, in looking at this case as a whole, the Northern District of Texas is better suited to adjudicate the matter. Accordingly, Defendant's #12 motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of Texas is granted. Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 7/26/2019. A certified copy of the attached order sent to Texas-Northern Court. (Case transferred to the Northern-District of Texas electronically). (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Silverberg on behalf of Farmer Bros. Co. (aty to be noticed) (Silverberg, Steven) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 18cv5499. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Farmer Bros. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #3 Memorandum in Support Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venur or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer) (Bledsoe, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, ECF No. #11 , is approved. Defendant shall serve its moving brief by August 17, 2018. Plaintiff shall serve its opposition by September 7, 2018. Defendant shall serve its reply and file the full briefed motion on ECF in accordance with the Court's individual rules by September 21, 2018. Defendant must also provide a courtesy copy of the fully briefed motion to chambers. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/11/2018. (Schnier, Samantha) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 11 Letter (Joint) re Proposed Briefing Schedule by Farmer Bros. Co. (Bledsoe, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR PREMOTION CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Jonathan Neuman. Counsel For Defendant: Marc Melzer, Stephen Bledsoe. Pre Motion Conference held on 6/28/2018 at 12:00 PM. Parties to submit a proposed briefing schedule by 7/13/2018. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #6 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A status conference will be held on 6/28/2018 at 12:00 PM with Judge Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/12/2018. (Posillico, Lauren) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Study Logic LLC. (Neuman, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/27/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/27/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10302694. by Farmer Bros. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Missouri) (Wallner, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10302558. by Farmer Bros. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Kansas, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Missouri) (Bledsoe, Stephen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Farmer Bros. Co.. (Melzer, Marc) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Farmer Bros. Co. (Melzer, Marc) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farmer Bros. Co. (Melzer, Marc) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmer Bros. Co. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 602158/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0207-10280728) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Study Logic LLC v Farmer Bros. Co Complaint) (Melzer, Marc) Modified on 3/16/2018 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 7/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Study Logic LLC v. Farmer Bros Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmer Bros. Co.
Represented By: Andrew Melzer
Represented By: Timothy D. Wallner
Represented By: Stephen M Bledsoe
Represented By: Steven Mark Silverberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Study Logic LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Ellery Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?