Valyrian IP LLC v. ICON Voice Networks LLC
Plaintiff: Valyrian IP LLC
Defendant: ICON Voice Networks LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01829
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 10/11/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/25/2019) (ykp)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ICON Voice Networks LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klemchuk, Darin)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/27/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/22/2019) (aaa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ICON Voice Networks LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klemchuk, Darin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mandi M Phillips on behalf of ICON Voice Networks LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Phillips, Mandi)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of ICON Voice Networks LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Drake, Kirby)
August 3, 2019 Filing 9 Designation of lead counsel Darin M Klemchuk for Defendant ICON Voice Networks LLC. (Klemchuk, Darin)
August 2, 2019 Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD***Summons Issued as to ICON Voice Networks LLC. (mla) Modified on 8/1/2019 (mla).
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ICON Voice Networks LLC. (aaa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD, ATTORNEY TO REFILE***CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valyrian IP LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Symbology Innovations LLC for Valyrian IP LLC. (Johnson, Jay) Modified corporate parent on 8/1/2019 (mla). Modified docket text on 8/27/2019 (aaa).
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Valyrian IP LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Valyrian IP LLC (Johnson, Jay)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ICON Voice Networks, LLC filed by Valyrian IP LLC. (Filing Fee $400, receipt number 0539-10155182) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Johnson, Jay) Modified filing fee information on 7/31/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valyrian IP LLC v. ICON Voice Networks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICON Voice Networks LLC
Represented By: Darin M Klemchuk
Represented By: Mandi M Phillips
Represented By: Kirby Blair Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valyrian IP LLC
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?