iMed Technology Inc v. Teleflex Inc et al
Plaintiff: iMed Technology Inc
Defendant: Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL and Arrow International Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01861
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff iMed Technology, Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Extend Time, Doc. #14 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Doc. #7 , is October 11, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/4/2019) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by iMed Technology Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time) (Gameros, Charles)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File. Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is 10/4/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/17/2019) (chmb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by iMed Technology Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gameros, Charles)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Defendants #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and for the United States Magistrate Judge to submit to the court proposed findings and recommendations for disposition of the motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/13/2019) (mla)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Arrow International Inc, Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL, Teleflex Medical Inc re #8 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Steinbrunner, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Arrow International Inc, Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL, Teleflex Medical Inc re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Steinbrunner, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Arrow International Inc, Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL, Teleflex Medical Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Steinbrunner, Ryan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ari M. Berman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/15/2019) (chmb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10192356) filed by Arrow International Inc, Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL, Teleflex Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Attorney Ari M Berman added to party Arrow International Inc (pty:dft), Teleflex Inc (pty:dft), Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd (pty:dft), Teleflex Medical Europe SrL (pty:dft), Teleflex Medical Inc (pty:dft) (Berman, Ari)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Initial Complaint by Arrow International Inc, Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL, Teleflex Medical Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Steinbrunner, Ryan)
August 5, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arrow International Inc, Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd, Teleflex Medical Europe SrL, Teleflex Medical Inc (see document attachment #1 -9 for image). (zkc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Inc, Teleflex Medical Europe, Ltd., Teleflex Medical Europe, S.r.L., Teleflex Medical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Teleflex Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TFX North America Inc. for Teleflex Medical, Inc.; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Teleflex Inc for Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Medical Europe, Ltd., Teleflex Medical Europe, S.r.L.. (Steinbrunner, Ryan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 162nd Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-08173 filed by Teleflex Medical, Inc., Teleflex Inc, Arrow International, Inc., Teleflex Medical Europe, Ltd., Teleflex Medical Europe, S.r.L.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10165452) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Index, #2 Exhibit A-1 State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit A-2 Petition, #4 Exhibit A-3 Teleflex Citation Return of Service, #5 Exhibit A-4 Teleflex Medical Citation Return of Process, #6 Exhibit A-5 Teleflex Europe Citation Return of Service, #7 Exhibit A-6 Teleflex SRL Citation Return of Service, #8 Exhibit A-7 Arrow Citation Return of Service, #9 Exhibit B - Certificate of Interested Persons, #10 Exhibit C - Declaration of Howard Cyr, #11 Exhibit D - Jury Demand, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Steinbrunner, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iMed Technology Inc v. Teleflex Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleflex Inc
Represented By: Charles Clayton Conrad
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Steinbrunner
Represented By: Ari M Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleflex Medical Europe Ltd
Represented By: Charles Clayton Conrad
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Steinbrunner
Represented By: Ari M Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleflex Medical Inc
Represented By: Charles Clayton Conrad
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Steinbrunner
Represented By: Ari M Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleflex Medical Europe SrL
Represented By: Charles Clayton Conrad
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Steinbrunner
Represented By: Ari M Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow International Inc
Represented By: Charles Clayton Conrad
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Steinbrunner
Represented By: Ari M Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iMed Technology Inc
Represented By: Charles W Gameros, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?