Sethi et al v. The American National Bank of Texas
Plaintiff: Shana Investments Inc, Sambina Trust, Praveen Sethi, Goku Investments Inc., Sambina Brookview Center Ltd, Sambina Homes Ltd, Sambina Properties Ltd and Goku Investments Inc
Defendant: The American National Bank of Texas
Case Number: 3:2019cv01882
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE filed by The American National Bank of Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Huttenbach, William)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has been resolved. Any trial setting and scheduling order are vacated. The parties have forty-five days to file dismissal papers. If the parties do not file dismissal papers within forty-five days, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/18/2019) (ykp)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT AND NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT filed by The American National Bank of Texas. (Huttenbach, William)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/12/2019) (zkc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The American National Bank of Texas identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The ANB Corporation Inc for The American National Bank of Texas. (Huttenbach, William) Modified corporate parent on 8/8/2019 (mla).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 116th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-06777 filed by The American National Bank of Texas. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10173743) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: Index of Documents Filed With Removal Action, #2 Exhibit(s) B: List of Counsel, #3 Exhibit(s) C: State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit(s) D: Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit(s) E: Citation, #6 Exhibit(s) F: Defendant's Motion to Transfer, Motion to Abate and/or Motion to Consolidate, #7 Exhibit(s) G: Subject to ANBTX Motion to Transfer and/or Motion to Consolidate, ANBTX Original Answer, Counterclaim, and Request for Disclosure, #8 Exhibit(s) H: Letter with Subpoena from Receiver, #9 Exhibit(s) I: Order, #10 Exhibit(s) J: Motion to Consolidate, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Huttenbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sethi et al v. The American National Bank of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Investments Inc
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sambina Trust
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praveen Sethi
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goku Investments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sambina Brookview Center Ltd
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sambina Homes Ltd
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sambina Properties Ltd
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goku Investments Inc
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American National Bank of Texas
Represented By: William P Huttenbach
Represented By: Kristina L Cunningham
Represented By: Yusuf S Ansari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?