Newman v Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Narada Newman
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01886
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney; served on 8/23/2019. (Herrick, Peter) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (zkc).
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Federal Bureau of Investigation; served on 8/12/2019. (Herrick, Peter) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (zkc).
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 8/19/2019 by Narada Newman (Herrick, Peter) Modified title, party and date on 8/26/2019 (awc).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter S. Herrick. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/15/2019) (chmb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin N Colquitt on behalf of Narada Newman. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Colquitt, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Narada Newman. (Herrick, Peter)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Narada Newman. (Herrick, Peter)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10175398) filed by Narada Newman (Herrick, Peter)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Motion for Seized Property against Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Narada Newman. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0539-10175291) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Herrick, Peter) Modified filing fee information and title on 8/8/2019 (mla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narada Newman
Represented By: Peter Stanwood Herrick
Represented By: Kevin N Colquitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?