Evanston Insurance Company v. Vantage Benefits Administrators Inc
Petitioner: Evanston Insurance Company
Respondent: Vantage Benefits Administrators Inc
Not Yet Classified: Stacey G Jernigan and Case Admin Sup
Case Number: 3:2019cv01921
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Evanston Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Order of September 24, 2019 by Judge Jernigan) (Economou, Cary)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of reply to response filed by Trustee Jeffrey H. Mims In Support of Evanston's Motion to Withdraw the Reference re: #2 Notice (Other) filed by Case Admin Sup (Attachments: #1 Reply to Response) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of response opposed to withdrawal of reference re: #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference,,,,, filed by Case Admin Sup (Attachments: #1 Response opposed to withdrawal of reference) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)
August 13, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (zkc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of transmittal of motion for Withdrawal of Reference in #bankruptcy case number 18-31351 to presiding judge. The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court. A link to the #Judges Copy Requirements is provided for your review. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Motion to withdraw the reference, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Declaration of Cary Joy Economou In Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference, #23 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference, #24 Proposed Order) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Vantage Benefits Administrators Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vantage Benefits Administrators Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Stacey G Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Cary Joy Economou
Represented By: Michael F Perlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?