Outdoor Identities LLC v. Creatuity Corp
Plaintiff: Outdoor Identities LLC
Defendant: Creatuity Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv01937
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Creatuity Corp to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is 10/17/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/11/2019) (chmb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Creatuity Corp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jason Ray Jobe added to party Creatuity Corp(pty:dft) (Jobe, Jason)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Creatuity Corp; served on 9/19/2019. (axm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Outdoor Identities LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Macklin, Heather)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Creatuity Corp. (ykp)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Outdoor Identities LLC. (Moxley, Terah)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff does not set forth the necessary allegations to establish its citizenship; that is, it does not identify each of its members and set forth their respective citizenships. Without this information, the court cannot determine whether complete diversity exists and whether it, therefore, has subject matter jurisdiction. Therefore, to ensure that this court has jurisdiction to hear this action, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint addressing the pleading defects identified by the court by 12:00 p.m., 9/20/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/4/2019) (epm)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather J. Macklin. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/15/2019) (chmb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Heather J. Macklin (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10191609) filed by Outdoor Identities LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moxley, Terah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Outdoor Identities, LLC. (Moxley, Terah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Creatuity Corp. filed by Outdoor Identities, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10189734) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Moxley, Terah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Outdoor Identities LLC v. Creatuity Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outdoor Identities LLC
Represented By: Heather J Macklin
Represented By: Terah Jean Moxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creatuity Corp
Represented By: Jason Ray Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?