Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company v. Domain Protection LLC
Plaintiff: Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company
Defendant: Domain Protection LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01939
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles C Frederiksen on behalf of Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Frederiksen, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/25/2019) (ndt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION For Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rivera, Richard)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Domain Protection LLC ; served on 8/24/2019. (Rivera, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Advantus, Corporation for Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company. (Rivera, Richard)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Domain Protection LLC. (aaa)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company. (Rivera, Richard)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Domain Protection LLC filed by Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10190144) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to be issued by Clerk) (Rivera, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company v. Domain Protection LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain Protection LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercury Luggage Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Richard Dean Rivera
Represented By: Charles C Frederiksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?