Genter et al v. Reed
Appellee: Dianne Reed
Appellant: Susie E Genter, Genter's LLC, Roger C Genter, Genter's Detailing Inc, Nubia Genter and Gumball Gumball LLC
Not Yet Classified: Case Admin Sup and Stacey G Jernigan
Debtor: Kevin Genter
Case Number: 3:2019cv01951
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Trustee's response opposed to motion for leave to appeal re: #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference,,,,,, filed by Case Admin Sup (Attachments: #1 Trustee's response opposed to Motion for leave to appeal) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)
August 15, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (zkc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the motion for leave to appeal in re: notice of appeal #bankruptcy case number 18-03361 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:19-cv-1951. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Motion for leave to appeal) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genter et al v. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dianne Reed
Represented By: Andrew B Sommerman
Represented By: Alexandria Risinger
Represented By: Sean J McCaffity
Represented By: Alexandria Marie Risinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susie E Genter
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Genter's LLC
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Roger C Genter
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Genter's Detailing Inc
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nubia Genter
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gumball Gumball LLC
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Stacey G Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Kevin Genter
Represented By: Jason P Kathman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?