Milligan v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2019cv01972
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Dallas Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,4,5. Fri Aug 16 16:20:51 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Habeas corpus petition is successive, and the clerk is directed to transfer the matter to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Fifth Circuit notified via copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing.) (Originally filed in case 3:17-cv-1837 as document #46) (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/16/2019) (axm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION re: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The new claim of ineffective assistance of counsel in the motion, (see doc. 41 at 2-3), should be construed as a successive habeas petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254, SEVERED, and TRANSFERRED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. (Originally filed in case 3:17-cv-1837 as document #44) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/29/2019) (axm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark Milligan, Sr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Originally filed in case 3:17-cv-1837-L as document #41) (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milligan v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?