Johnson v. Ryan C Hoerauf Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Glendale Johnson
Defendant: Ryan C Hoerauf Inc and Ryan C Hoerauf
Case Number: 3:2019cv01992
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00205. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
August 7, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas Dallas Division. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Change Venue and transferring this case to the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division, for all future proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/16/2019. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Thomas Glendale Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hommel, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Glendale Johnson. Ryan C. Hoerauf served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(Hommel, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Ryan C. Hoerauf, Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ryan C. Hoerauf with attachment)(Rouse, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District Judge J. Campbell Barker for all further proceedings. District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/28/19. (tkd, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
May 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thomas Glendale Johnson. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Ryan C. Hoerauf, Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Ryan C. Hoerauf)(mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
May 8, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan C. Hoerauf, Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7260380.), filed by Thomas Glendale Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 8/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ryan C Hoerauf Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C Hoerauf Inc
Represented By: R. Layne Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C Hoerauf
Represented By: R. Layne Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Glendale Johnson
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?